RI H7786 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Empowers the health insurance commissioner to establish payor guidelines to develop and maintain a system allowing patients electronic access to their health claims information pursuant to federal regulations by 7/1/17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Medical Billing Innovation Act Of 2016

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-16HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2016-07-08HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2016-06-17HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-17HouseScheduled for consideration (06/17/2016)
2016-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016)
2016-03-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback