RI H7778 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts vehicle owners by a rental company from provisions permitted to the DMV to refuse registration for failure to pay fines including interest, penalties, or other monetary amount.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-04-24HouseHouse read and passed
2018-04-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/24/2018)
2018-04-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback