RI H7769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows residential only projects to remain minor and subject to the lesser time period for certification. Adds more time for cert. And resubmission at the master and preliminary plan phases on major projects but reducing such time for the final plan.
Title
Subdivision Of Land
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7769.pdf |