RI H7768 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the director of the department of environmental management to promulgate rules and regulations to permit the administrative enforcement of regulations pertaining to cruelty to animals.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7768.pdf |