RI H7767 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any toll facility shall if it engages in enforcement of traffic laws do so only as authorized by ยงยง42-13.1-11 and 42-13.1-12.
Title
Rhode Island Bridge Replacement, Reconstruction And Maintenance Fund--tolls
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7767.pdf |