RI H7764 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits abortions solely as a means of sex selection.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7764.pdf |