RI H7761 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the age to purchase or possess a rifle or shotgun from 18 years of age to 21 years of age, "grandfathers" current ownership by persons under 21 years of age, and makes an exemption for police and military.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7761.pdf |