RI H7752 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes the state's prohibition on adults using, possessing, and cultivating marijuana for personal use. Establishes a system of regulated marijuana retail distribution to adults 21 and older and imposes taxes at both the wholesale and retail level.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation And Regulation Of Marijuana

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-04-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2016)
2016-02-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback