RI H7749 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Reapportionment
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Reapportionment
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7749.pdf |