RI H7748 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires E-911 system division to update system by allowing user access by text or internet.
Title
E-911 Uniform Emergency Telephone System Division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-26 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016) |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |