RI H7747 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/21/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enables a chief executive of a town or city to appoint a representative or senator to a vacant seat in the general assembly until a special election is held.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacancy In General Assembly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseWithdrawn at sponsor's request (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback