RI H7746 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Provides that landlords would pay interest on security deposits in residential landlord-tenant matters.
Title
Provides that landlords would pay interest on security deposits in residential landlord-tenant matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Jennifer Boylan [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7746.pdf |