RI H7736 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any person, including, but not limited to, a minor who is pregnant, could give effective consent for medical, dental, health and hospital services relating to prenatal, delivery, and post-delivery care.
Title
Consent To Medical And Surgical Care
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7736.pdf |