RI H7726 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends child support for children attending college and living with custodial parent; restricts the court's power to modify existing orders of child support regarding arrearages owed to custodial parent even if the parties agree to waive.
Title
Divorce And Separation -- Child Support
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7726.pdf |