RI H7725 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a seventy-two (72) hour hold to be ordered by a physician in certain instances of substance abuse disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Commitment For Drug Intoxication

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed floor amendment only
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-04-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback