RI H7715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the possession of firearms on school grounds except for peace officers, retired law enforcement officers, persons under contract to provide school security services, and unloaded firearms in locked containers or a locked rack on motor vehicles.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Meeting postponed (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7715.pdf |