RI H7715 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires governor to submit a zero-based budget, to be phased out in over five (5) years.
Title
State Budget
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7715.pdf |