RI H7711 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Meeting postponed (04/11/2018)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Meeting postponed (04/11/2018)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires charter school populations to reflect the combined demographics of the sending district(s).
Title
Establishment Of Charter Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Meeting postponed (04/11/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7711.pdf |