RI H7709 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Sunsets the provision which allows first-time violators to avoid the fine by presenting proof of acquisition of a hands-free device prior to the imposition of the fine effective September 1, 2022.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-05-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/19/2022) |
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-06 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |