RI H7702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits insurance companies from penalizing pharmacies or medical providers from disclosing information regarding the cost of medication or the availability of therapeutically equivalent alternative medications or methods of purchasing the medication.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7702.pdf |