RI H7695 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies current procedures for the application and collection of court costs, fees and assessments in all criminal matters.
Title
Probation And Parole Support Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2022) |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |