RI H7674 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides personal property used as a residence qualifies for a homestead exemption. Further, a homestead exemption is subordinate to mortgage signed by all of the property's owners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure Generally - Levy And Sale On Execution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-26HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2016-07-18HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2016-06-13SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016)
2016-05-10SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2016-04-12HouseHouse read and passed
2016-04-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/12/2016)
2016-03-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2016-03-25HouseScheduled for consideration (03/29/2016)
2016-03-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2016)
2016-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback