RI H7669 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions of law relative to the disclosure of confidential health care records and the disclosure thereof occurring through electronic means.
Title
Mental Health Law
Sponsors
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-15 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |