RI H7657 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gives any resident of a city or town lacking RIPTA bus service a credit on such resident's Rhode Island income tax of $.03 per gallon of gas purchased in this state.
Title
Personal Income Tax - Tax Credit Where Ripta Service Not Provided
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7657.pdf |