RI H7654 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add the executive director of the Coastal Resources Management Council to the state planning council.
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-11 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2014-05-07 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2014) |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/17/2014) |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |