RI H7649 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents health insurers from requiring subscriber trial use of non-opiate drugs before they will approve the use of opiate drugs.
Title
Access To Abuse-deterrent Pain Medications
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7649.pdf |