RI H7645 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminalizes the manufacture, import, possession, purchase, sale or transfer of any ammunition feeding device capable of accepting more than 10 rounds, known as high capacity magazines. Makes exceptions for law enforcement and the US armed forces.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7645.pdf |