RI H7645 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study United Healthcare's Practices As They Relate To The Healthcare Of The Consumer (creates Legislative Study Commission To Study The Practices Of United Healthcare With Respect To The Health Care Of The Consumer.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study United Healthcare's Practices As They Relate To The Healthcare Of The Consumer (creates Legislative Study Commission To Study The Practices Of United Healthcare With Respect To The Health Care Of The Consumer.)
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7645.pdf |