RI H7640 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- CRIMINAL INJURIES COMPENSATION - Specifically adds healthcare employees to those persons eligible under the criminal injuries compensation statute if they are assaulted during the course of their employment.
Title
Specifically adds healthcare employees to those persons eligible under the criminal injuries compensation statute if they are assaulted during the course of their employment.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7640.pdf |