RI H7625 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides full year insurance coverage for contraceptives and would provide coverage thereto. Section 9 of this act, pertaining to Medicaid, would take effect July 1, 2019. The remaining sections would take effect April 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HouseSenate voted to reconsider
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-18SenateScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2018-06-06HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-03-23HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback