RI H7618 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the maximum reimbursement rate for licensed child care providers by five percent (5%).
Title
Child Care--state Subsidies
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7618.pdf |