RI H7615 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protects homeless persons in possession of a service animal, as defined under the Americans with Disabilities Act, from being denied access to any homeless shelter in violation of the ADA or the state or federal Fair Housing Practices Acts.
Title
Homeless Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |