RI H7613 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence, And Who Would Report Back To The House Of Representatives By February 7, 2019, And Expire On May 7, 2019.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence, And Who Would Report Back To The House Of Representatives By February 7, 2019, And Expire On May 7, 2019.)
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018) |
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7613.pdf |