RI H7612 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Boiler Inspection And Pressure Vessels (would Amend The Hearing Procedure For Boiler And Pressure Vessel Violations By Eliminating Hearings Before Compensated Arbitration Panels And Permitting Hearings Before The Occupational Safety And Health Review Board.)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Boiler Inspection And Pressure Vessels (would Amend The Hearing Procedure For Boiler And Pressure Vessel Violations By Eliminating Hearings Before Compensated Arbitration Panels And Permitting Hearings Before The Occupational Safety And Health Review Board.)
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-07 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Labor | |
2012-03-14 | House read and passed | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on House Calendar (03/14/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-02-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7612.pdf |