RI H7611 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights (would Amend The Definition Of Law Enforcement Officer To Include Any Campus Police Officer In The State.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights (would Amend The Definition Of Law Enforcement Officer To Include Any Campus Police Officer In The State.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7611.pdf |