RI H7599 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide minimum mandatory sentences for certain quantities of synthetic drugs.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-05 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-05-22 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-24 | House | Meeting postponed (03/25/2014) |
2014-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |