RI H7597 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to disclose information regarding the award and contract amount for road construction or repair projects.
Title
Construction And Maintenance Of State Roads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7597.pdf |