RI H7594 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in housing against those persons who have a lawful source of income.
Title
Fair Housing Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/10/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7594.pdf |