RI H7570 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits students to possess and use over-the-counter products to treat menstrual cramps or vaginal yeast infections during school activities without a doctor's or parent's note.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |