RI H7564 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Department Of Labor And Training (would Require The Disclosure By State Agencies Of Certain Labor-related Information Necessary To Investigate Certain Violations Pursuant To This Chapter.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Department Of Labor And Training (would Require The Disclosure By State Agencies Of Certain Labor-related Information Necessary To Investigate Certain Violations Pursuant To This Chapter.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2012-06-12 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-06-11 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7564.pdf |