RI H7557 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions of the general laws allowing deferred deposit providers, also known as "payday lenders."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Loan Lenders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-11HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (05/16/2018)
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback