RI H7557 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions of the general laws allowing deferred deposit providers, also known as "payday lenders."
Title
Small Loan Lenders
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-11 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/16/2018) |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7557.pdf |