RI H7555 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations To Allow Private Bidders To Purchase The Naming Of Various State Properties (this Resolution Would Create A Nine (9) Member Commission To Study The Feasibility Of Allowing The Sale Of Naming Rights To Publicly Owned Facilities In-state, And Who Would Report Back No Later Than February 3, 2015, And Would Expire April 3, 2015.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations To Allow Private Bidders To Purchase The Naming Of Various State Properties (this Resolution Would Create A Nine (9) Member Commission To Study The Feasibility Of Allowing The Sale Of Naming Rights To Publicly Owned Facilities In-state, And Who Would Report Back No Later Than February 3, 2015, And Would Expire April 3, 2015.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7555.pdf |