RI H7552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Efficacy Of Decentralizing The Rhode Island Department Of Motor Vehicles By Establishing Branch Offices In Each City Or Town (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study Of The Efficacy Of Decentralizing The Dept. Of Motor Vehicles By Establishing Branch Offices In Each City Or Town, And Who Would Report Back By February 7, 2021, And Expire On May 7, 2021.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Efficacy Of Decentralizing The Rhode Island Department Of Motor Vehicles By Establishing Branch Offices In Each City Or Town (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study Of The Efficacy Of Decentralizing The Dept. Of Motor Vehicles By Establishing Branch Offices In Each City Or Town, And Who Would Report Back By February 7, 2021, And Expire On May 7, 2021.)
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7552.pdf |