RI H7550 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for a credit equal to the amount contributed by a taxpayer for the taxable year to the Rhode Island Ocean State Fund, which is created in the general fund to accept monetary contributions for exclusively public purposes.
Title
Rhode Island Ocean State Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7550.pdf |