RI H7548 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Personal Income Tax (would Add Home And Hospice Care Of Rhode Island To The Contribution Check Offs Available On The Rhode Island Personal Income Tax Return.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Personal Income Tax (would Add Home And Hospice Care Of Rhode Island To The Contribution Check Offs Available On The Rhode Island Personal Income Tax Return.)
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Peter Petrarca [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7548.pdf |