RI H7543 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes it a misdemeanor for persons to carry, possess, or wear masks or protective clothing or equipment designed to minimize the risk of injury from deadly weapons, for the purposes of hindering law enforcement crowd control actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disorderly Conduct - Protective Equipment And Disguised Masks Prohibited

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020)
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback