RI H7533 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/11/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/11/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Subjects obligors of child support to license suspension after a 60-day arrearage but provides conditional driving privileges for employment.
Title
Full Enforcement Of Support Obligations
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/11/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7533.pdf |