RI H7529 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana (extends The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana From March 1, 2018 To February 1, 2019, And Said Commission Expires On May 1, 2019.)
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana (extends The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana From March 1, 2018 To February 1, 2019, And Said Commission Expires On May 1, 2019.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | House | House read and passed |
2018-03-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |