RI H7529 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish qualifications/procedures to license underground utility contractors. It would also enlarge the contractor's registration and licensing board from fifteen (15) to seventeen (17) members to administer and to oversee the licensees.
Title
Underground Utility Contractors
Sponsors
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Underground utility contractors approval of amendment lc 004360/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |